judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD LEE WORMAN and SHERRI LYNNE WORMAN, Deceased v. BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY,

Case Heading (S-10-0162)
Case Number:S-10-0162Case Docketed On:07/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:RONALD LEE WORMAN and SHERRI LYNNE WORMAN, Deceased v. BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY,
Full Title:RONALD LEE WORMAN and SHERRI LYNNE WORMAN, Deceased, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald Lee WormanLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson
John R. Vincent
Aaron Joseph Vincent
AppellantSherri Lynne WormanLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson
John R. Vincent
Aaron Joseph Vincent
AppelleeBP America Production CompanyJohn Matthew Walker
John Anthony Coppede
Robert John Walker
Robert John Walker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Arbitration, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 54
Citation:248 P.3d 644

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/26/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/13/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants; and Statement of Costs - Rule 10.01 W.R.A.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee BP America Production CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/11/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John M. Walker for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry B. Jones for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V; Transcripts & Arbitration Documents; Volume VI, Depositions, Transcripts & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert J. Walker for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Larry B. Jones for appellants; John Matthew Walker and Robert John Walker, argument by Mr. Robert J. Walker for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/13/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal