Case Information: 16-CV-0457 | |||
Short Caption: | JUSTIN MARKIEWICZ V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB8298-15 | Filed Date: | 05/09/2016 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/09/2016 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 06/22/2016 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/22/2017 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Justin Markiewicz | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | District of Columbia | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
05/09/2016 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/01/2016 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
06/20/2016 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
06/20/2016 | Filed | No Transcript Needed | ||
06/22/2016 | Filed | Record Index | ||
06/22/2016 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/29/2016 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
08/08/2016 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
08/08/2016 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
09/09/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
09/26/2016 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to October 12, 2016 | ||
10/12/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
11/08/2016 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | ||
11/09/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Denied as Moot | |
11/23/2016 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal or in the Alternative, Summary Affirmance (Appellee) | ||
11/23/2016 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) | Denied | |
12/06/2016 | Filed | TMC - Motion to Dismiss Appeal or in the alternative, summary affirmance // Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) | ||
12/19/2016 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to respond to the appellees' pending motions (Appellant) | Granted | |
12/21/2016 | Filed | Order Granting MOET for appellant to file response to appellee's motion to dismiss. Response due 1/6/17 | ||
01/17/2017 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/31/2017 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
01/31/2017 | Filed | Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance; FO appellee's mot. to supplement is denied; FO appellant's motion for leave to file lodged reply brief is granted, reply brief filed; FO appellee's motion for ext. denied as moot; FO appeal affirmed | ||
01/31/2017 | Filed | Affirmed | ||
02/22/2017 | Filed | Mandate |