Case Information: 17-CF-0610 | |||
Short Caption: | IRA J. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-18264-16 | Filed Date: | 06/08/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/08/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 08/18/2017 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/13/2018 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/12/2019 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/15/2019 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/08/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/15/2017 | Filed | Initial Order - Directing Statement Regarding Transcripts | ||
06/15/2017 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Donna L. Biderman, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
07/14/2017 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record- #1 (25 pages/tape) 11/10/16 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (122 pages/Rogers) 2/23/17 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (121 pages/Clark) 2/27/17 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (203 pages/Gardener) 2/28/17 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (204-284 pages/Gardener) 3/1/17 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (18 pages/tape) 6/8/17 proceeding | ||
08/18/2017 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/22/2017 | Filed | Record Index | ||
08/22/2017 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
08/24/2017 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
10/02/2017 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/25/2017 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 12/20/17 | ||
12/20/2017 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/09/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 3/16/18 | ||
03/14/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | ||
03/26/2018 | Filed | Order Granting MOET (for RT reasons) | ||
03/27/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (29 pages/tape) 2/27/17 proceeding | ||
04/06/2018 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte, that appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed w/n 40 days and appellee's brief shall be filed w/n 30 days thereafter. | ||
05/16/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
05/24/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) and appellant's lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. F/O that appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 28, 2018. | ||
05/24/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
05/24/2018 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) (Attached to Brief) | ||
06/28/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
07/16/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/13/18 | ||
08/13/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
08/13/2018 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/29/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
12/20/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
02/11/2019 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
02/12/2019 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion to file reply brief. | ||
02/12/2019 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
02/12/2019 | Filed | Submitted To Associate Judges Thompson, McLeese, and Senior Judge Washington. | ||
06/21/2019 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ | ||
07/15/2019 | Filed | Mandate | ||
07/16/2019 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) |