judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW C. KURTENBACH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0262)
Case Number:S-11-0262Case Docketed On:11/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:MATTHEW C. KURTENBACH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW C. KURTENBACH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Christopher KurtenbachDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppellantMatthew Christopher Kurtenbach Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 162
Citation:290 P.3d 1101

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/21/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/21/2012Motion - Extension of timeMotionExtension of time - file response/objectionFinal
02/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order. (docket number should be S-11-0262)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/20/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (third)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/20/2012Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2012Order - Grant - extension of time (third extension, no further extensions will be considered)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/07/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/25/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/16/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/20/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntary, filed pro se. Appellant's certificate of service indicates Motion was mailed 07/10/2012, neither AG or PD had received a copyMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
07/20/2012Motion - Remand to district court, pro se. Certificate of service indicates Motion was mailed 07/10/2012, neither AG nor PD received copy of motionMotionRemand to district courtFinal
08/07/2012Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Order Denying Motion for RemandOrderDenyFinal
08/13/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Appellant re Motion and notice of change of address. Also requested copy of mandate from previous case, referred to State ArchivesCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/20/2012Service - Mail returned - Order mailed to prior institution where Appellant housedServiceMail returnedFinal
11/16/2012Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/16/2012Motion - Supplemental briefing, pro seMotionSupplemental briefingFinal
12/04/2012Order - Denying Motion to Withdraw Counsel and Order Denying Request to File Pro Se Supplemental BriefOrderDenyFinal
12/17/2012Motion - Other - Motion for Expedited Denial of AppealMotionOtherFinal
12/18/2012Event - Phone Call from AG's office. They will not be responding to the motion filed by Appellant.EventPhone CallFinal
12/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing for lack of jurisdiction. Justice Golden, Ret. writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/02/2013Order - Denying Motion for Expedited Denial of AppealOrderDenyFinal
01/04/2013Event - Phone Call from the AG's office. They will not be responding to the "Petition for Rehearing" they received in the mail today. We have not received the pleading yet.EventPhone CallFinal
01/07/2013Petition - Rehearing - Petition for Rehearing/Motion for Order of Exhaustion (AG will not be responding). Certificate of Service dated 1/2/2013 from W.M.C.I.PetitionRehearingFinal
01/15/2013Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/15/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/15/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal