judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE DISCIPLINE OF CHARLES A. PRICE

Case Information: 36488
Short Caption:IN RE DISCIPLINE OF CHARLES A. PRICECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/27/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-13078
08/02/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss. 00-13354
08/09/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. 00-13823
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. On August 2, 2000, Price filed a motion to dismiss this disciplinary proceeding. On August 9, 2000, the state bar filed an opposition to Price's motion. Having considered all of Price's arguments and concluding that they lack merit, we deny the motion to dismiss this disciplinary proceeding. The record in this matter was filed on July 27, 2000. To date, no opening brief has been filed. Price shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an opening brief. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with SCR 105(3)(b). If Price fails to file an opening brief, then this matter shall be considered upon the record. 00-16580
10/10/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/10/00. 00-17895
11/13/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/10/00. 00-19802
12/08/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/08/00. 00-21517
01/19/2001Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. " . . . we adopt the recommendation of the panel, and disbar Price." In addition, Price must promptly pay any additional amounts found to be owed by the district court. Price must pay the costs of the disciplinary proceeding. Price and the state bar shall comply with the provisions of SCR 115. Fn1[The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] En Banc-WM/CY/MS/RR/ML/NB 01-01281
01/26/2001Other Other. Filed Motion for Reconsideration. (Petition for Rehearing). 01-01765
02/02/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. 01-02261
02/06/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 01-02438
02/07/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), "Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration."
02/15/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. 01-02994
02/23/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We grant Price's motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for rehearing. We direct the clerks of this court to file the proposed reply received on February 15, 2001. The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter. EN BANC- WM/CY/MS/RR/ML/NB 01-03487
02/23/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. 01-02995
02/26/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Permission to File Reply. 01-03576
02/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 23, 2001, this court entered an order denying rehearing. That order granted Price's motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for rehearing. On February 26, 2001, counsel for the State Bar of Nevada filed an opposition to Price's motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for rehearing. This court having denied Price's petition for rehearing, no action will be taken with regard to the opposition of the State Bar of Nevada. 01-03701
03/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3 this day. 01-03691
03/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/04/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2001. 01-03691