judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN RUSSELL REYNOLDS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0263)
Case Number:S-11-0263Case Docketed On:11/17/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:JOHN RUSSELL REYNOLDS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN RUSSELL REYNOLDS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn Russell ReynoldsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 120
Citation:284 P.3d 823 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/10/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/13/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/07/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - received copy of Order Settling and Approving Statement of Evidence from the District CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
03/22/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/29/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/11/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 9/28/12ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal