judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANCER VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36494
Short Caption:DANCER VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35063 , 35107 , 40703 , 44313
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A371500Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/14/2001 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/14/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Shirinian & Roitman--check no. 2541.
07/31/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-13170
07/31/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. 00-13173
07/31/2000ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 7 to Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition--Filed Separately and under Seal. 00-13175
08/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days
08/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 00-14052
09/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-15532
10/04/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. (file answer). 00-17581
10/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulation filed October 4, 2000, is treated as a joint motion. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The real parties in interest shall have to and including October 16, 2000, within which to file and serve the answer to the petition. 00-17714
10/17/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent's/Real Parties in Interest's Reply to Petitioners' Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. 00-18417
10/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's/Real Parties in Interests' Appendix. 00-18418
05/02/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 14, 2001 at 9:30 a.m. (En Banc)
05/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Michael J. Rusing of Rusing & Lopez will appear before the Nevada Supreme Court to argue the petition for writ of mandamus to be heard by the Honorable Court on June 14, 20001 beingging at 9:30 a.m. 01-08007
05/17/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Ara H. Shirinian regarding the "Notice of Appearance" filed on May 14, 2001.
05/21/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Ara H. Shirinian in response to this court's letter of 5/17/01, enclosing SCR 42 documents filed in district court. (received via fax) 01-08436
05/23/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Ara H. Shirinian in response to this court's letter of 5/17/01, enclosing SCR 42 documents filed in district court. (Original-filed via fax on 5/21/01. No action required.) 01-08649
05/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/06/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Bradley Shafer for Real Party in Interest Little Darlings. 01-09424
06/07/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Order Admiting to Practice (Bradley Shafer) filed in the district court on June 1, 2001 (via fax - no action required). 01-09486
06/11/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Allow Filing of Supplemental Authorities. 01-09674
06/11/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Ara Shirinian enclosing copy of Order Admitting to Practice for attorney Michael J. Rusing filed in district court on June 1, 2001. 01-09709
06/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 11, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental authorities received on June 7, 2001. 01-09892
06/13/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Second copy of Supplement Authorities received on 6/7/01 with attachments for Little Darlings. (Supplemental Authorities (Little Darlings) with original signature of counsel received 6/6/01, attached to the Second copy of Supplemental Authorities received 6/7/01 (01-09425). 01-09492
06/14/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC
07/05/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Allow Filing of Second Supplemental Authorities. 01-11340
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 5, 2001, the real parties in interest filed a motion for leave to file a second supplemental authorities. No good cause appearing, we deny that motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the supplemental authorities received on July 5, 2001. 01-13710
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Allen Lichtenstein. Returned unfiled, the Original Supplemental Authorities, received on June 5, 2001.
12/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." EN BANC. Maupin, C.J., Young, Shearing, and Leavitt, JJ. Becker, J., with whom Agosti, J., and Rose, J., agree, concurring. 01-20462
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-20766
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.