judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PATTI MOHR V. THE RICHMOND CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Case Information: 11-CV-0530
Short Caption:PATTI MOHR V. THE RICHMOND CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8594-10Filed Date:04/25/2011

Opening Event Date:04/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/13/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPatti Mohr NPro SeN
AppelleeRichmond Condominum AssociationN
John H. BrillianYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/16/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 25, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and filed with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been order and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of ther order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
06/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
06/13/2011RECORD INDEX
06/13/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/22/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Ferren
04/06/2012FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
04/30/2012FiledMandate