judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KOECHER VS. GARCIA

Case Information: 36493
Short Caption:KOECHER VS. GARCIACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A376780Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Mendoza, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Albert D. Massi, Ltd.--check no. 26701.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13167
07/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/21/00. To Court Reporter: Vicki Turner. 00-13201
07/31/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/21/00, 6/22/00. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 00-13202
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/24/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 4/21/00. To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 00-14919
08/28/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Apriol 21, 2000, April 26, 2000. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson 00-15045
11/27/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-20640
12/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-21400
12/07/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.