judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHON ASCENSION GONZALEZ PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0270)
Case Number:S-11-0270Case Docketed On:11/23/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CHON ASCENSION GONZALEZ PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHON ASCENSION GONZALEZ PENA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChon Ascension Gonzalez Pena Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/23/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record and request for District Court Clerk, forwarded.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/06/2011Order - Confirming this Court's Jurisdiction Over this AppealOrderOtherFinal
01/12/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
01/12/2012Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
01/30/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/02/2012Event - Other - Received copy of Appellant's briefEventOtherFinal
02/03/2012Correspondence - Outgoing to Appellant and returning briefs per MSKCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal