judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUKE DEIULIIS, ET AL V. MARIO J. SEGRETI

Case Information: 11-CV-0529
Short Caption:LUKE DEIULIIS, ET AL V. MARIO J. SEGRETIClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-1021 Consolidated: 10-CV-1039 , 11-CV-0529, 11-CV-1111 , 12-AA-1656
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4255-04Filed Date:04/25/2011

Opening Event Date:04/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/02/2013Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/2014
Argued/Submitted:06/04/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLuke Deiuliis N
Lois R. GoodmanNY
AppellantAntoinette Witt N
Lois R. GoodmanNY
AppelleeMario J. Segreti N
Michael B. McGovernNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/25/2011 On consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that a briefing order has been issued in appeals nos. 10-CV-1021 and 10-CV-1039, and it further appearing that transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-529, and on further consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, which held appellant's motion to stay appeal in abeyance, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CV-529 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CV-1021 and 10-CV-1039 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' motion to stay is denied as moot. It is (MORE)
05/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing order issued on January 5, 2011, is hereby vacated and a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in appeal no. 11-CV-529 as required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
08/10/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (29 pgs/Tape) (8/24/07 proc.)
08/10/2011FiledSupplemental Record #6 (21 pgs/Tape) (11/16/07 proc.)
08/10/2011FiledSupplemental Record #7 (34 pgs. -- Tape) (1/30/09 proc.)
09/20/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals and Directing a Consolidated briefing order upon the filing in this court by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index in appeals nos 11-CV-529 and 11-CV-111 and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A).
10/03/2011FiledRecord Index 11-cv-529 & 11-cv 1111
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #8 (4-pgs/tape 1/14/11 proc.)w/cd
11/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record#9 (69-pgs/tape 4/25/08 proc.)
11/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record#10 (15-pgs/tape 3/7/08 proc.)
11/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record #11 (23-pgs/tape 7/13/07 proc.)
11/09/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/15/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2012FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee)
01/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 60 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
02/27/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/25/2012FiledOpposition to appellants motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee)
05/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
05/07/2012StruckBrief (Appellant)
05/07/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) vol. I thru IV
05/14/2012FiledMotion To Strike brief for appellant and joint appendix (Appellee)Granted
05/17/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's motion to strike appellant's brief and joint appendices (Appellant)
05/18/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLNANT'S BRIEF & APPDX//OPPO
06/20/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION and APPELLANTS' BRIEF IS HEREBY STRUCK and APPELLANTS SHALL FILE A CONFORMING BRIEF W/N 20 DAYS
07/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/10/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/11/2012FiledSupplemental Record #12 (9-pgs/tape 12/19/08 proc.) w/cd
08/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
09/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/04/2012FiledMotion for leave to file decision and order of the rental housing commission as a supplement to the brief for appellee or, in the alternative, as a supplemenetal appendix (Appellee)Denied
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (3 weeks) Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/16/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/16/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion for leave to file decision and order of the rental housing commission as a supplement to the brief for appellee or, in the alternative, as a supplemenetal appendix (Appellee)
10/16/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Consolidate 12-AA-1656 with previously consolidated appeals. nos. 10-CV-1021, 10-CV-1039, 11-CV-529 and 11-CV-1111
10/16/2012FiledOrder in petition no. 12-AA-1656 directing the administrative agency to file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of the order
10/16/2012FiledInitial Order 12-AA-1656
10/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (3 weeks) Reply Brief (Appellant) *COMBINED REPLY BRIEF AND INITIAL BRIEF DUE AFTER ISSUANCE OF BRIEFING ORDER IN 12-AA-1656
11/08/2012FiledRecord On Appeal (12-AA-1656)
12/06/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
12/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File for leave to intervene as a party Other (Intervenor)Granted
12/16/2012FiledOpposition to Mario Sergetti's Motion to Intervene (Petitioner)
01/15/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File for leave to intervene as a party Other (Intervenor)
01/15/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
02/20/2013FiledLetter From OAH requesting additional time to certify the transcript per the Court's order dated 1/15/13
03/01/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte granting the Office of Administrative Hearings request for an additional 30 days to certify the transcripts
04/17/2013FiledLetter From re: transcript (Respondent Office of Administrative Hearings)
05/02/2013FiledSupplemental Record
05/02/2013FiledRecord Completed - 12-AA-1656
05/15/2013FiledOrder directing appellants/petitioner's combined reply brief in appeal no. 10-CV-1021, 10-CV-1039, 11-CV-529, & 11-CV-1111 within 40 days from the date of this order
05/15/2013FiledBriefing Order in petitiion for review no. 12-AA-1656
06/25/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief (Appellant)Granted
07/10/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief (Appellant)
09/09/2013FiledBrief (12-AA-1656) (Appellant)
09/09/2013FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
09/09/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
10/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)Granted
10/16/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
10/16/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)
12/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
12/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)Granted
12/13/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
12/23/2013FiledOpposition to motion for an extension of time to file briefs. (Petitioner)
01/13/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion and Corrected Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
01/13/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Intervenor)
01/23/2014FiledBrief (Intervenor)
01/23/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
02/06/2014FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
02/12/2014FiledJoint Appendix (Appellant)
02/12/2014FiledReply Brief (12-AA-1656) (Petitioner)
02/18/2014FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)
02/18/2014FiledOpposition- to Rental Housing Commission's motion for an extension of time to file its brief (Appellant)
02/18/2014FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
02/24/2014FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (RHC)
02/24/2014FiledBriefing Completed
04/03/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/03/2014FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/09/2014FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Corsetti) (Appellant)
04/09/2014FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Segreti) (Appellee)
05/01/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/04/2014FiledArgued before Associate Judge Fisher, Associate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Ruiz. (Lois R. Goodman, Esq. for appellant) (Michael B. Mcgovern, Esq. for appellee)
09/23/2014FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed & Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Ruiz, Senior Judge)
09/30/2014FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (AMENDED) (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and Ruiz, Senior Judge)
10/22/2014FiledMandate
11/07/2014FiledMotion To Publish (Amicus Curiae)Denied
11/10/2014FiledOpposition to DC Office of Administrative Hearing's motion for extension of time and motion for publicity on memorandum opinion and judgment (Appellant)
12/10/2014FiledOrder Denying motion to publish.