judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUANHASA (LUAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36473
Short Caption:LUANHASA (LUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36737
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C93956Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Request for Permission to file a Late Direct Appeal from Judgment of Conviction. 00-12823
08/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[Petitioner appears to be alternately known as Luan Hasa and Luan Luanhasa.] fn2[We express no opinion regarding whether or not petitioner can satisfy the procedural requirements of NRS chapter 34.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14249
09/11/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-14452
09/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed November 7, 2000, and placed on the docket as Case No. 00-6923. 00-19899
01/18/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 01-01178