judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHEN D. DAVIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0148)
Case Number:S-10-0148Case Docketed On:07/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:STEPHEN D. DAVIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEPHEN D. DAVIS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen D. Davis Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/20/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/05/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/11/2010Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from Mr. Davis requesting that his notice of appeal be treated as petition.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/18/2010Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to appellant regarding case.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal