judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINE NODINE, Personal Representative of the Estate of DAVID NODINE v. JACKSON HOLE MOUNTAIN RESORT CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0265)
Case Number:S-11-0265Case Docketed On:11/18/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:CHRISTINE NODINE, Personal Representative of the Estate of DAVID NODINE v. JACKSON HOLE MOUNTAIN RESORT CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:CHRISTINE NODINE, Personal Representative of the Estate of DAVID NODINE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JACKSON HOLE MOUNTAIN RESORT CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristine NodineTerry W. Mackey
Philip White Jr.
Andrew L. Payne
Shannon Turner Hays
AppelleeJackson Hole Mountain Resort CorporationJames Kent Lubing
Mikel L. Moore
Leah Kathleen Corrigan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Estates
Opinion Number:2012 WY 72
Citation:277 P.3d 112

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/18/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/18/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/22/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
11/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mikel L. Moore.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/30/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/22/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
12/27/2011Brief - Appellant (Motion for admission pro hac vice for Shannon Hays is not pending)BriefAppellantFinal
12/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission pro hac vice of Andrew L. Payne; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Order granting admission of attorney pro hac vice - Andrew L. Payne.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Christine NodineEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2012Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for withdrawal of counsel (Pamela T. Harvey)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2012Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel Pamela T. HarveyOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/10/2012Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee re brief due date. Appellant's brief contains wrong dates for e-filing and service of hard copies.EventPhone CallFinal
02/14/2012Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re due date of Appellee's brief. Appears to be a typographical error in cert. of service causing tickler date error.EventPhone CallFinal
02/14/2012Motion - Other - Motion pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.11(b)MotionOtherFinal
02/14/2012Motion - Correct a Document (amended certificate of service)MotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
02/14/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/15/2012Event - Phone Call from Counsel for Appellee, will be filing a response to motionsEventPhone CallFinal
02/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.11(b) with the correct amended certificate of service.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/21/2012Response/Objection - Other - Appellee's brief in opposition to motion pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.11(b) and alternative motion for relief pursuant to W.R.A.P. 1.03 and W.R.Civ.P. 60Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/22/2012Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
02/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission pro hac vice of Shannon Turner Hays; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2012Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Shannon Turner Hays for AppellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
02/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief in opposition to motion pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.11(b) and alternative motion for relief pursuant to W.R.A.P. 1.03 and W.R.Civ.P.60EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2012Motion - Withdraw a DocumentMotionWithdraw a documentFinal
02/27/2012Order - Granting withdrawal of appellant's motionOrderGrantFinal
03/01/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Withdrawal of Motion Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 711(b)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Christine NodineEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/08/2012Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
03/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Request to Place on Expedited DocketEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Mikel L. Moore obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2012Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Terry W. Mackey obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Memorandum in opposition to Appellant's request to place case on the expedited docket.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/27/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/23/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/08/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/08/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/14/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/12/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal