judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARK ANTHONY CATES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0524
Short Caption:MARK ANTHONY CATES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16894-10Filed Date:04/26/2011

Opening Event Date:04/26/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMark A. Cates Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Dineen A. BakerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/26/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Robert LaBelle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/11/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert LaBelle, Esquire `
05/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcripts attached (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/04/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (75pgs/Shelton) 4/8/11 proc.
08/04/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (116pgs/Shelton) 4/11/11 proc. w/CD
08/04/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/09/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/11/2011FiledRecord Index
08/11/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 14, 2011
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 14, 2011
12/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 13, 2012
01/17/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/25/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing appellee's brief within 30 days from the date of this order
01/25/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/25/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/24/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Easterly, Schwelb
09/11/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges, and schwelb, Senior Judge.)
09/17/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/03/2012FiledMandate