judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHULTS (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32190
Short Caption:SCHULTS (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54610
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C032583Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/03/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
04/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings, in each of the above-identified appeals. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32139, 32140, 32141, 32182, 32190, 32219, 32220, 32227.
08/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to Waive (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
08/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to Submit Appellant's Opening Brief (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
08/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant).
08/13/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Appendix to the Brief (Received the original only).
09/03/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 9 (copies).
09/03/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/06/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Motion for: "Confession of Error". (Original and 3 copies--1 copy returned).
08/09/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Motion for an Index of the Record on Appeal. (Original and 3 copies-1 copy returned).
01/25/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Propria Persona. (Received the original and 3 copies-1 copy returned).
02/11/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion to Correct and Modify the Record on Appeal Nunc Pro Tunc N.R.A.P. 10(c). (Received original and two copies-one copy returned).
04/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
05/04/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing and Suggested Rehearing En Banc. (Received orignal and seven copies-1copy returned).
05/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
06/08/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (Received original and ten copies-1copy returned).
06/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
07/05/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000.
07/31/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. This is a proper person petition for en banc reconsideration of a panel decision. We have reviewed the petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decisions are not warranted. " . . . We deny the petition." En Banc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB