judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOVAN EDWARDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0523
Short Caption:JOVAN EDWARDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD241-11Filed Date:04/26/2011

Opening Event Date:04/26/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJovan EdwardsY
Dinah WileyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kendra D. BriggsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/26/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Dinah Wiley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/11/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dinah Wiley, Esquire
05/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (47pgs/Tape) 4/13/11 proc. w/CD
06/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/09/2011RECORD INDEX
06/09/2011RECORD COPIES
07/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File brief to 8/18/11 and appendix Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 18, 2011
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
09/23/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/20/2011FiledOrder Granting Summary Affirmance
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
01/11/2012FiledMandate