Case Information: 36484 | |||
Short Caption: | ESCOBEDO-GUEVARA (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44366 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990990 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/25/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/25/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-12846 | |
10/03/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn1[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] | 00-17558 | |
10/17/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 10/12/00 appointing the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as counsel for appellant. | 00-18384 | |
10/23/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender's Office. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 00-18704 | |
10/23/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/23/00. To Court Reporter: S. Kiger. | 00-18709 | |
11/06/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-19469 | |
01/31/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/29/01. | 01-02067 | |
01/31/2001 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 01-02071 | |
02/21/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/20/01. | 01-03262 | |
02/23/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. | 01-03432 | |
02/23/2001 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | ||
03/01/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Court reporter Kiger shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with the clerk of this court a certificate acknowledging delivery of the completed transcript and a certified copy of the transcript of the June 23, 2000 district court proceedings. | 01-03820 | |
03/15/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. with certificate attached - Proceedings: 06/23/00. Court Reporter: Susan C. Kiger. | 01-04684 | |
05/30/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-08997 | |
06/26/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-09023 | |
06/26/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2001. | 01-09023 |