judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JOHN VENUTI

Case Information: 11-BG-0517
Short Caption:IN RE: JOHN VENUTIClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN325-10Filed Date:04/28/2011

Opening Event Date:04/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJohn Venuti N
Richard A. Hibey NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/28/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland suspending respondent for six months.
05/13/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals, Maryland, suspending respondent for six months from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions fo the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions fo Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
05/19/2011RECEIVED a copy of a letter from Bar Counsel to respondent advising respondent of the importance in filing an affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 (g).
05/25/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent.
06/08/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
06/09/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of bar counsel - proposed order
06/23/2011FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that John Venuti, Esquire is hereby suspended from the practiceof law in the District of Columbia for a period of six months, nunc pro tunc to May 19, 2011. (BR,NE,KG)