judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROSIE C. GRANT-RIDLEY V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0516
Short Caption:ROSIE C. GRANT-RIDLEY V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB195-10Filed Date:04/28/2011

Opening Event Date:04/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/13/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorJohnny Rockets N
David M. SchoenfeldNY
IntervenorGallahger Bassett ServicesN
David M. SchoenfeldYY
PetitionerRosie C. Grant-Ridley N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/28/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/28/2011FILING FEE of $100.00
04/28/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb.
05/23/2011NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE - as intervenors Johnny Rockets and Gallagher Bassett Services
06/13/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
06/13/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/07/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED David Schoenfeld 1233 20th St., N.W.-8th fl
07/20/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
07/20/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (D.C.)Granted
08/22/2011FiledBrief (Intervenor Gallahger Bassett Services, Intervenor Rockets)
08/31/2011LodgedReceived - statement from intervenors stating no objections to DOES motion for extension of time to file brief (Intervenor Gallahger Bassett Services, Intervenor Rockets)
09/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
09/08/2011FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (D.C.)
09/08/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
04/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
04/30/2012FiledMandate