judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEELY VS. EVANS

Case Information: 36483
Short Caption:NEELY VS. EVANSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405545Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/28/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12844
07/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/28/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael H. Singer-check no. 1962.
01/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: Attorney's and parties continuing to negotiate for the ensuing 30-60 days. 01-01780
02/22/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-03375
05/14/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. regarding Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed on February 22, 2001. 01-08004
07/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On February 22, 2001, attorneys Michael H. Singer and Christopher L. Birkin of the law firm of Michael H. Singer, Ltd., filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants. Cause appearing, we grant counsel's motion to withdraw. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellants and file proof of such service with this court. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel to represent them in this appeal and to cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. Alternatively, if appellants do not intend to obtain new counsel, they shall so inform this court within the same time period. New counsel, if obtained, will be expected to which this appeal is assigned. 01-11180
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Our 7/3/01 order directed former counsel for appellants to serve a copy of the order on appellants and file proof of service of the order within 10 days. To date counsel has failed to file proof of service with the court. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order and the 7/3/01 order on appellants and file proof of service with this court. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause counsel to enter a notice of appearance with this court, or if they do not intend to obtain new counsel, to inform this court within the same time period. New counsel will be expected to participate in the settlement conference program. 01-17862
10/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Entry of Orders of 7/3/01 and 10/23/01 served on all parties. 01-17993
02/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 30, 2001, we received a document from appellant Hal Neely stating that 'appellants no longer retain Nevada counsel.' A trust may not proceed in proper person in this court. We vacate those portions of our orders entered on July 3, 2001, and October 23, 2001, directing appellant Pacrim Music Limited Trust to inform this court if it does not intend to retain new counsel. Pacrim Music Limited Trust shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel to represent it in this appeal and to cause counsel to file a notice of appearance in this court. Failure to retain counsel will result in the dismissal of this appeal as to Pacrim Music Limited Trust. 02-02120
05/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 1, 2002, we entered an order directing appellant Pacrim Music Limited Trust to retain new counsel. To date, a notice of appearance as counsel for the trust has not been filed. We dismiss this appeal as to appellant Pacrim Music Limited Trust. The clerk of this court shall remove Pacrim Music Limited Trust as appellant from the caption on this court's docket. On November 30, 2001, and February 22, 2002, we received documents from appellant Hal Neely indicating that appellants Hale Neely and Virginia Wise-Neely do not intend to retain counsel to represent them in this appeal. We remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. This appeal shall proceed as a proper person appeal. 02-09068
06/26/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11019
07/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11176
07/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2002. 02-11176