judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRUCKEE MEADOWS FIRE PROTECTION DIST. VS. TRUCKEE MEADOWS FIREFIGHTERS

Case Information: 36491
Short Caption:TRUCKEE MEADOWS FIRE PROTECTION DIST. VS. TRUCKEE MEADOWS FIREFIGHTERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9904489Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/2000 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/28/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13114
08/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Hon. Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 12, 2000. To Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown (Sierra Nevada Reporters). 00-13899
08/10/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Not on form provided and not due pending settlement conference).
08/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 14, 2000. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 00-14365
12/01/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-21019
12/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
12/08/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss for Mootness. 00-21523
12/13/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-21812
12/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Truckee Meadows Fire Protection District's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Mootness. 00-22055
12/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (all briefs). 00-22737
12/29/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Mootness. 00-22738
01/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. We grant TMFF's motion for leave to file a reply. The clerk of this court shall file TMFF's reply received on December 29, 2000. The briefing schedule shall remain suspended, pending this court's resolution of the motion to dismiss as moot. We deny as moot TMFF's motion to enlarge the time to file briefs. 01-00281
01/05/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Mootness. 00-22739
06/08/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. (Law firm of Dyer, Lawrence, Cooney & Penrose).
07/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondent Truckee Meadows firefighters, Local 2487, hs moved to dismiss the appeal as moot. The District opposes dismissal. "We conclude that this appeal is moot, and we grant the Union's motion to dismiss it." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11359
07/30/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11615
07/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 14, 2002. 02-11615