judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEOFFREY KREISS V. TRANSWESTERN CAREY WINSTON, LLC

Case Information: 11-CV-0527
Short Caption:GEOFFREY KREISS V. TRANSWESTERN CAREY WINSTON, LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC5685-08Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeoffrey Kreiss N
Steven KreissYN
AppelleeTranswestern Carey Winston LLCN
Rand L. GelberYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 20, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and filed with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being order, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (159-pgs/wycoff 3/23/11 proc.)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (160 to 255 pgs/wycoff 3/24/11 proc) w/cd
06/07/2011RECORD INDEX
06/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/23-24/11) (elp)
06/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/01/2011FiledReply to aplt's motion for enlagement of time (Appellee)
08/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/31/2011FiledOpposition to motion for enlargement of time to file brief and appendix. (Appellee)
09/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix to 9/12/11.
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledAppendix (Volume 1 & 2) (Appellant)
10/07/2011FiledMotion To File Excess-Pages of brief (Titled: Aple's motion to exceed page limit for reply brief) (Appellee)Denied as Moot
10/11/2011FiledAnswer/Response to aple's motion to exceed page limit for brief. (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledMotion To File Excess-Pages - of reply brief (Appellant)
11/07/2011LodgedReply Brief (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledOrder Denying As Moot Motion To File Excess-Pages of brief (Titled: Aple's motion to exceed page limit for reply brief) (Appellee)
11/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellee) and Supplemental Appendix (Appellee)
11/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/2011FiledReply to aplt's motion to exceed page limit for reply brief (Appellee)
12/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave brief that exceeds the page limits but not the supplemental appendix. (FIBRTE)
12/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/17/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)Granted
03/08/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File (Appellant)
03/08/2012FiledREPLY BRIEF Appendix (Appellant)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/01/2012FiledMotion to correct citations in its principal and reply briefs (Appellant)Granted
05/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to correct citations.
05/15/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Fisher,Easterly Steve Kreiss Esq.,for appellant, Rand L.Gelber Esq.,for appellee.
05/30/2012FiledMotion to clarify a response made by counsel at oral argument on May 15, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
06/05/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to clarify a response at oral argument.
06/28/2012FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
07/23/2012FiledMandate