judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHARP VS. STATE, DMV

Case Information: 36492
Short Caption:SHARP VS. STATE, DMVCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38526
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV15122Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/2000 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Walter B. Fey--check no. 1244.
07/28/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13122
07/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Hon. Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 8/10/00. 00-14302
01/31/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: Matter will be set in March. 01-02050
04/20/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-06770
04/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
05/03/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-07465
05/11/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-07913
05/11/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-07916
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 01-10991
07/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-12867
08/08/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. 'ORDER this appeal DISMISSED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-13428
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13518
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 6, 2001. 01-13518