judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY PARKER, ET AL V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORP.

Case Information: 11-CV-0528
Short Caption:ANTHONY PARKER, ET AL V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORP.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM5669-09Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/05/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Parker N
David J. WildbergerNN
Kathleen H. MeredithYN
AppellantMuna Parker N
David J. WildbergerNN
Kathleen H. MeredithYN
AppelleeWashington Hospital Center CorporationN
Stuart N. HerschfeldNN
John M. Fitzpatrick NN
LaMar F. JostYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/20/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (*ATTACHED TO THE NOTICE OF APPEAL) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/7/11, 3/7/11, 3/8/11, 3/9/11, 3/10/11, 3/14/11, 3/15/11, 3/16/11, 3/17/11, 3/21/11, & 3/22/11)
05/13/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 20, 2011, and the statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
07/05/2011RECORD INDEX
07/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (94-pgs/coney 3/7/11 proc.)
07/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (186-pgs/coney 3/8/11 proc)
07/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (187-pgs/coney 3/9/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (195-pgs/coney 3/10/11 proc.)
07/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (194-pgs/wycoff 3/14/11 proc.)
07/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (220-pgs/wycoff 3/15/11 proc)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 (140-pgs/wycoff 3/16/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (119-pgs/wycoff 3/17/11 proc)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#9 (236-pgs/wycoff 3/21/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#10 (123-pgs/wycoff 3/22/11 proc.)
10/03/2011FiledSupplemental Record #11 (114-pgs/Etekochay 3/7/11 proc.)w/cd
10/03/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/14/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Anthon & Muna Parker)Granted
11/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Anthon & Muna Parker)
12/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant Parker)
12/07/2011FiledAppendix Volumes I-V (Appellant Parker)
01/11/2012FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of aple / receipt attached (Appellee)Washington Hosp. Center Corp.Granted
01/13/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of aple / receipt attached (Appellee)Washington Hosp. Center Corp.
01/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellee)Granted
01/18/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Supplemental Appendix (Appellee)
01/18/2012FiledSupplemental Appendix - Vol. VI (Appellee)
02/06/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant Parker)
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/14/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From John M. Fitzpatrick & LaMar Jost (Appellee)
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/28/2012FiledNotice Received from attorney Wildberger letting court know that he's arguing the case (Appellant Parker)
10/01/2012FiledNotice Received of substitution of oral argument letting court know that LaMar F. Jost will argue case (Appellee)
10/02/2012FiledNotice Received stating that Kathleen Howard Meredith will argue the case instead of David J. Wildberger (Appellant Parker)
10/03/2012FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, McLeese, Reid Kathleen H. Meredith, Esq. for appellant Lamar F. Jost, Esq. for appellee
11/13/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and McLeese, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge)
12/05/2012FiledMandate