judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAYES (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36475
Short Caption:HAYES (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C161198Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/26/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12829
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36415, 36428, 36441, 36443, 36474, 36475. Document No. 00-13570.
11/20/2000BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Nos. 36474 and 36475).
12/26/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 12/22/00. 00-22417
12/26/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the records on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] Nos. 33924/35622 (cases are not consolidated.) SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03407
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03750
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03750