judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DARNELL TAYLOR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0118)
Case Number:S-10-0118Case Docketed On:05/27/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DARNELL TAYLOR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DARNELL TAYLOR, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDarnell TaylorDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Andrew Jean Kuhlmann

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:
Citation:246 P.3d 596

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/27/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/14/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/21/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/07/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/25/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal