judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY JAMES FULLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0272)
Case Number:S-11-0272Case Docketed On:11/23/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JEFFREY JAMES FULLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEFFREY JAMES FULLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey James Fuller Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/23/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/06/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/09/2011Motion - Reconsideration of Order Dismissing AppealMotionReconsiderationFinal
12/13/2011Petition - Rehearing (reinstate appeal)PetitionRehearingFinal
01/04/2012Order - Denying Requests to Treat Notice of Appeal as Petition for Writ of ReviewOrderDenyFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal