judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. OSCHE

Case Information: 36495
Short Caption:SMITH VS. OSCHECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9905527Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13186
09/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-15992
09/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 00-16254
09/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/09/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Response. Respondent shall have 30 days from this order's date within which to demonstrate why the district court's judgment should not be reversed and the case remanded for further proceedings. 03-00453
03/06/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." fn7[We note that our January 9, 2003 order directing a response to the appeal observed, among other things, that the district court may have abused its discretion in failing to rule on smith's motion to be transported to court for trial. Upon further review of the record, however, it appears that Smith failed to submit his motion for decision as required by Washoe District Court Rule 12(4).] SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-03790
04/01/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 03-03902
04/01/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/07/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2003. 03-03902
04/08/2003Other Returned Mail. Remittitur dated 04/01/03 addressed to John D. Smith. No forwarding address.