judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARL WILLIAM PETERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0140)
Case Number:S-10-0140Case Docketed On:06/25/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CARL WILLIAM PETERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CARL WILLIAM PETERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarl William PetersonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Anthony Barton

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel
Opinion Number:2012 WY 17
Citation:270 P.3d 648

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/10/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/12/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/24/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Second motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2010Order - Grant - extension of time - Order granting appellant's second request for extension to file briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/12/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Third Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2010Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further extensions will be consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/27/2010Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
12/27/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Appellant's Motion for Partial Remand for Evidentiary Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel, Affidavit of David E. Westling in Support of Appellant's Motion for Partial Remand for Evidentiary Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel, and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from AG's office - they will not respond to motion to remand.EventPhone CallFinal
01/19/2011Order - Remand - Calene Partial RemandOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
04/22/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court re status of remand, Calene hearing is scheduled for 04/25/2011. Original setting vacated for medical reasons.EventPhone CallFinal
05/12/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law (Calene Remand)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
05/12/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk requesting that they notify this office when the transcripts from the Calene Hearing held on 04/25/2011 are filed.EventPhone CallFinal
05/23/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion re remand hearingRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
05/23/2011Order - Lifting Stay and Setting Briefing ScheduleOrderLifting StayFinal
06/22/2011Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
06/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
08/05/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/30/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Transcripts & Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joshua Beau Taylor for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Joshua Beau Taylor, Student Director, PAP, argument by Mr. Taylor for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/29/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal