judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRANT W. WOODHOUSE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0504
Short Caption:BRANT W. WOODHOUSE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7116-09Filed Date:04/15/2011

Opening Event Date:04/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/01/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrant W. WoodhouseN
Matthew D. EstesYN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Fire & Emergency Medical ServN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 15, 2011, and it appearing that appellant is proceeding on appeal in cost-waived status pursuant to 38 U.S.C. $4323 (h)(1), and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a motion with the Court Reporting Division for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s) for determination in accordance with Hancock V. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co. 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit your motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether traanscripts will be provided at no costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that document with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
05/24/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal. (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 2/25/11) (elp)
08/15/2011FiledRecord Index
08/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (32-pgs/rogers 2/25/11 proc.)w/cd
08/16/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/24/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee District of Columbia Fire & Emergency Medical Serv)Granted
12/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee District of Columbia Fire & Emergency Medical Serv)
01/19/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 21, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
02/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 21, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
02/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 10 days to March 2, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
02/23/2012FiledOpposition to appelle's third motion for an extension of time (Appellant)
03/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for an additional 10 days to March 2, 2012. Brief (Appellee District of Columbia)
03/09/2012FiledBrief (Appellee District of Columbia, Appellee District of Columbia Fire & Emergency Medical Serv)
03/09/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/09/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
08/28/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
09/18/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Reid, Matthew D. Estes Esq.,for appellant. Mary L. Wilson Esq.,for appellee.
10/09/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Reid)
11/01/2012FiledMandate