judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERST (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 32916,32917,33199,33400,33623

Case Information: 33624
Short Caption:FERST (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 32916,32917,33199,33400,33623Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32916 *, 32917 , 33199 , 33400 , 33623 , 33624Related Case(s): 32916
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C132803Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00340
07/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn4[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warrnted.] NNP99B-RR/C/DA. Nos. 32916, 32917, 33199, 33400, 33623, 33624. 00-11711
08/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13591
08/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 10, 2000. 00-13591