judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARVIN BRENT RAGETH and SHERRI L. RAGETH v. SIDON IRRIGATION DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-10-0141)
Parent:S-10-0141Case Docketed On:06/28/2010
Consolidated: S-10-0184
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:MARVIN BRENT RAGETH and SHERRI L. RAGETH v. SIDON IRRIGATION DISTRICT
Full Title:MARVIN BRENT RAGETH and SHERRI L. RAGETH, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. SIDON IRRIGATION DISTRICT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarvin Brent RagethHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantSherri L. RagethHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppelleeSidon Irrigation DistrictMary Helen Reed

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Water Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 121
Citation:258 P.3d 712

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/28/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellants re second notice of appeal and briefing. Case will have separate briefing schedule.EventPhone CallFinal
08/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' opening briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/01/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
10/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to consolidate.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/05/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
10/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2010Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
11/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Briefs; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kara Brighton for appellants Rageth.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mary Helen Reed for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Harriet M. Hageman and Kara Brighton, argument by Ms. Brighton for appellants; Mary Helen Reed for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/12/2011. (This was signed for by the Clerk of the Fourth Judicial District Court - Johnson County. She will forward to the Fifth Judicial District Court - Big Horn County)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/13/2011Event - Phone Call - Received call from Clerk of Court in Fourth Judicial District. She received the record and letter that should have been sent to the Fifth Judicial District. Discovered system error with addresses in the Master Dist. List. Clerk will forward record to correct district court.EventPhone CallFinal