judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ANTHONY ZARUBA v. MILDRED NOVAK ZARUBA

Case: B-4275
B-4275
10/31/1973
Application for Writ of Error
ANTHONY ZARUBA
MILDRED NOVAK ZARUBA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/22/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/22/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/13/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/1974Response to Motion filed
05/22/1974Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
05/22/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/22/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/13/1973Response to Petition
10/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anthony ZarubaPetitioner
Mildred Novak ZarubaRespondent
John H. HollowayAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information