judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CATHY MARTIN v. PHILLIP DEWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO

Case Heading (S-11-0277)
Case Number:S-11-0277Case Docketed On:12/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:CATHY MARTIN v. PHILLIP DEWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO
Full Title:CATHY MARTIN, Petitioner, v. PHILLIP DEWITT and JEANNE M. PRIETO, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerCatherine MartinJack John C. Hoard
RespondentPhillip DeWittThomas Reese
RespondentJeanne M. PrietoThomas Reese

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/02/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/02/2011Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
12/16/2011Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
12/19/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Respondent requested signed original.EventPhone CallFinal
12/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2012Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
01/04/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal