judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36499
Short Caption:SCOTT (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000624Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 00-13242
08/14/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel on Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of Filing Deadlines Pending the Court's Ruling on the Instant Motion. 00-14141
08/17/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on August 15, 2000. 00-14392
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The August 14, 2000 motion is granted and the Washoe County Public Defender's Office is relieved of any further obligation regarding this appeal. Jack Alian is hereby ordered to comply NRAP 3C and, within 10 days from the date of this order, file on behalf of this appellant a transcript request form in compliance with 3C, or a certificate stating that no transcript is required in this appeal. Further Jack Alian shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. 00-15012
09/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. 00-15999
09/13/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 7, 2000. Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. 00-16129
10/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Alian shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why Alian should not be sanctioned. 00-19077
11/13/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-19794
11/13/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-19795
11/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-20654
01/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . the judgment of conviction is affirmed." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-02003
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02090
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2001. 01-02090