judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AGUIRRE (PEDRO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36498
Short Caption:AGUIRRE (PEDRO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0305Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-13239
08/24/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14928
08/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14929
08/31/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15415
10/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not err in dismissing his petition. " . . . the order of the district court dismissing appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus is affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-18854
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19394
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2000. 00-19394