judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMELIA HINES V. CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDS

Case Information: 11-AA-0520
Short Caption:AMELIA HINES V. CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00498-11Filed Date:05/02/2011

Opening Event Date:05/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAmelia HinesYPro SeN
RespondentCampaign for Tobacco-Free KidsN
Ruth EisenbergNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/02/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW-NPT PER 5/31/11 ORDER LW
05/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/31/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION IS GRANTED and the petitioner shall proceed on appeal IFP and the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT to MAY 6, 2011. It is ***MORE****
05/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED since the motion for reconsideration is pending before the agency... (BY: ETW)
05/31/2011TMC - OTSC
07/26/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
07/26/2011WithdrawnDismissed
07/29/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Petitioner)
08/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Reinstating Appeal, directing record and respondent to identify counsel
09/28/2011FiledOrder directing respondent to identify counsel
10/12/2011FiledAppearance by Ruth Eisenberg (Respondent)
12/02/2011FiledMotion to issue a 2nd order, to OAH, to file the Administrative Record (no oppo). construed as motion to compel the record (Petitioner)Denied as Moot
12/21/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/transcript & exhibits
12/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
12/30/2011FiledOrder Denying as moot motion to compel record as moot
12/30/2011FiledBriefing Order
02/01/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
02/01/2012FiledMotion to waive the appendix (Petitioner)Granted
02/07/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WAIVE APPENDIX//RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
02/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
02/23/2012FiledORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO WAIVE THE APPENDIX TO THE EXTENT ONLY OCUMENTS REQUIRED BY R. 30(f)(2001) ARE REQUIRED and GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ITS BRIEF SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 9, 2012
03/09/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
03/12/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//LODGED OPPO
03/14/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
06/14/2012FiledORDER, SS, that the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION and GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/14/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's motion for summary affirmance. (Petitioner)
06/14/2012FiledAffirmed
06/28/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Petitioner)Denied
08/16/2012FiledOrder Denying petitioner's petition for rehearing.
01/09/2013FiledMandate