judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLEETWOOD VS. SWAIN

Case Information: 33621
Short Caption:FLEETWOOD VS. SWAINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A368425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/1999 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Linda L. Lehman--check no. 2613.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00337
01/25/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent, University Medical Center's Motion to Dismiss Appellants' Notice of Appeal. 99-00492
01/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing (mailed on: 01/28/99). 99-00667
02/03/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Johnson. (Notice of Change of Attorney Name.)
02/05/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Notice of Appeal. 99-00834
02/05/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00835
03/22/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Linda Lehman--check no. 2698.
03/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-02077
03/25/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
04/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement concerning the notice of appeal filed on March 8, 1999. 99-03157
05/03/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Mailed on 4/28/99. 99-03493
05/07/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. 99-03671
05/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On May 7, 1999, the parties filed a "Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals." The notice of appeal filed January 11, 1999, and the notice of appeal filed March 8, 1999, were both docketed in Docket No. 33621. The stipulation is disapproved as moot. 99-04050
05/24/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. 99-04255
07/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-06347
07/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-07009
08/18/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-07697
08/18/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-07698
09/28/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). FN1[We deny a moot respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal filed on january 25, 1999]. SNP/CLK 99-09293
09/28/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.