judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CIRO PAOLO FORMISANO v. GABE GASTON

Case Heading (S-10-0138)
Case Number:S-10-0138Case Docketed On:06/23/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:CIRO PAOLO FORMISANO v. GABE GASTON
Full Title:CIRO PAOLO FORMISANO, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GABE GASTON, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCiro Paolo FormisanoC. John Cotton
AppelleeGabe GastonRebecca A. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Employment Law, Negligence, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 8
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/23/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/23/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/24/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
09/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - appellant's motion to vacate and reset oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
09/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/06/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C. John Cotton for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Rebecca Lewis for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/10/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (C. John Cotton for appellant; Rebecca A. Lewis for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/07/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal