judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROCHELLE V. SAVAGE-BEY V. LA PETITE ACADEMY INCORPORATED

Case Information: 11-AA-0502
Short Caption:ROCHELLE V. SAVAGE-BEY V. LA PETITE ACADEMY INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02167-10Filed Date:04/25/2011

Opening Event Date:04/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/21/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRochelle V. Savage-Bey Y
John C. KeeneyYN
David A. Young NN
RespondentLa Petite Academy IncorporatedNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/25/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
04/25/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/25/2011APPEARANCE of John C. Keeney, Jr. and David A. Young as counsel for Petitioner.
04/25/2011MISCELLANEOUS Certification of Practice Pro Bono Publico from David A. Young, Esq.
04/25/2011ORDER GRANT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of David A. Young, Esq., pro hac vice on behalf of Rochelle Savage-Bey. It is (MORE)
05/20/2011 ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
05/20/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/20/2011FiledOrder Granting PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
08/30/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
08/31/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/07/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/17/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/17/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - schedule before merits
12/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/27/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Thompson,Schwelb
08/30/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
08/31/2012FiledLetter Received from appellant's attorney re: 3 errors in the opinion (Petitioner)
09/21/2012FiledMandate