judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF MCALLEN, TEXAS v. JOHN HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case: B-4315
B-4315
11/20/1973
MISC PETITION
CITY OF MCALLEN, TEXAS
JOHN HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/10/1974Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
02/15/1974Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
01/15/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
01/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/28/1973Motion for RehearingRelator
11/20/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/10/1974Brief in Support of Petition
02/15/1974Brief in Support of Petition
01/15/1974Brief in Support of Petition
01/14/1974Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
01/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/11/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/28/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/11/1973Letter Filed
11/23/1973Response to Motion filed
11/20/1973Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
11/20/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of McAllen, TexasRelator
Commissioners Court of Ector CountyAmicus Curiae
Law Offices of Baker and Botts, Fulbright and Crooker, Vinson, Elkins, Searls, Connally and SmithAmicus Curiae
CITY OF ODESSAAmicus Curiae
McCall, Parkhurst and HortonAmicus Curiae
John Hill, Attorney GeneralRespondent
Odessa Industrial Development Corp., Odessa Chamber of Commerce, Greater San Antonio Chamber of Commerce, San Antonio Industrial Foundation, Greater Laredo Development Foundation, Council for South Texas Economic Progress, Harlingen Ave. Chamber of CommAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information