judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROOKE AND SHAW VS. 9TH JDC

Case Information: 33620
Short Caption:BROOKE AND SHAW VS. 9TH JDCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 97CV0199Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Certiorari
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brooke & Shaw-check no. 12780.
01/15/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 99-00295
01/19/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due Date: 10 days.
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-00504
02/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer. We grant petitioner's motion for a stay of the district court's order requiring relinguishment of the files pending resolution of this appeal. 99-00719
02/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Answer in Opposition to Application for Writ of Certiorari. 99-01182
02/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Excerpt of Record. 99-01183
07/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Judgment: " . . . we grant the petition." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of certiorari. fn1[In light of this decision, we vacate our stay of the district court's order, and we deny petitioner's motion for a stay under NRS 34. 070]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-05860
07/06/1999WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Charles Zumpft for service upon Judge Gamble. 99-05909
07/22/1999WritFiled Writ. Personally served on The Honorable David R. Gamble, Judge of the Ninth Judicial District Court, on July 19, 1999. 99-05909
08/03/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-07120
08/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.