judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD LEE BLAGG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0137)
Case Number:S-10-0137Case Docketed On:06/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:RICHARD LEE BLAGG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD LEE BLAGG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Lee Blagg Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2010 WY 140
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/09/2010Brief - Anders (No Response Time)BriefAndersFinal
08/09/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/09/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
08/25/2010Record - Other - Staff Attorney retrieved cd exhibit, disk was broken in halfRecordOtherFinal
08/31/2010Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
08/31/2010Event - Phone Call to office of Public Defender to confirm Appellant's addressEventPhone CallFinal
10/19/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/27/2010Opinion - Published order Affirming the Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
11/16/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to district court. The hard drive that had been sent with record was given to court security for return to district court.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/22/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/19/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal