judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEAN D. JONES V. D.C. GOVERNMENT PERSONNEL

Case Information: 11-AA-0501
Short Caption:JEAN D. JONES V. D.C. GOVERNMENT PERSONNELClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00473-11Filed Date:04/25/2011

Opening Event Date:04/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJean D. Jones YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Government PersonnelN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/25/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW-NPT PER 5/26/11 ORDER LW
04/25/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/26/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the LODGED PFR, NPT, TO APRIL 25, 2011. It is ****MORE****
05/26/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS AMEND THE PFR to reflect the March 23, 2011 order and failure to comply shall result in dismissal of the petition. Vines v. Manufacturers & Traders Trust Co... (BY: ETW)
06/08/2011RECEIVED - copy of amended order 3/23/11
06/27/2011 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's MAY 26, 2011 ORDER...and petitioner's response which identified the March 23, 2011 Final Order as the order to be reviewed on appeal, it is ORDERED that this court's MAY 26, 2011 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED and the Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect the March 23, 2011 order as the appealable order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the OAH shall file the administrative record w/n 60 days... (BY: ETW) LW
06/28/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
09/16/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
09/16/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify of 3/21/11 proceedings.
09/16/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/04/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
11/04/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
12/21/2011FiledOrder directing motion & brief (Respondent)
01/06/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Respondent)Granted
02/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance. (Petitioner)Granted
02/27/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/27/2012FiledORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION and the LODGED MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS FILED and GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION and the OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER MARCH 15, 2012
02/27/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)
04/03/2012FiledReceived amended certificate of service for the district of columbia's motion for leave to file its response to Ms. Jones's opening brief out of time anfd its motion for summary affirmance (Petitioner)
04/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
04/24/2012FiledAffirmed
05/16/2012FiledMandate