judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO COLBERT V. JUDGE JOAN ZELDON

Case Information: 11-CV-0512
Short Caption:ANTONIO COLBERT V. JUDGE JOAN ZELDONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM1670-11Filed Date:04/21/2011

Opening Event Date:04/21/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio Colbert NPro SeN
AppelleeJoan Zeldon NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/09/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 21, 2011, and it appearing that the $100 docketing fees has not been paid, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order tender the $100 filing fee or file a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and a fully completed financial information statement pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
05/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 9, 2011, which directed appellant to tender the $100 filing fee or to file a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
05/31/2011DISMISSED
06/23/2011MANDATE ISSUED