judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC

Case Heading (S-10-0154)
Case Number:S-10-0154Case Docketed On:07/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC
Full Title:JOHN THORKILDSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. MARGOT BELDEN, and FISH CREEK DESIGN, LLC, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn ThorkildsenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeMargot BeldenRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeFish Creek Design, LLCRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees
Opinion Number:2011 WY 26
Citation:247 P.3d 60 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/15/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/11/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/12/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/26/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/17/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/07/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/14/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal