judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOOTE (RICKY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36479
Short Caption:FOOTE (RICKY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C078675Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12836
07/26/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14316
10/03/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-17423
10/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17504
10/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2000. 00-17504