judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURTON (HOMER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36478
Short Caption:BURTON (HOMER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37174
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C129019Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12833
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal is premature, and we dismiss this appeal without prejudice to appellant's right to appeal from a final, written order or the district court denying his petition. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15282
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15446
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15446