judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOLA CHELTENHAM V. WASHINGTON METRO AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Case Information: 11-CV-0511
Short Caption:LOLA CHELTENHAM V. WASHINGTON METRO AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0420 Consolidated:11-CV-0511
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAV7679-08Filed Date:04/13/2011

Opening Event Date:04/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeWashington Metro Area Transit AuthorityN
Gerard J. StiefNN
Carol B. O'KeeffeNN
Nicholas L. PhucasNY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantLola Cheltenham N
Gregory L. LattimerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/09/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that transcripts needed for appeal 11-CV-511 have been previously ordered in appeal no. 11-CV-420, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-420 and 11-CV-511 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
05/09/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record indexes and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A). (JAC) elp
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (114pgs/price 2/28/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (147-psg/price 3/1/10 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 ( 96-pgs/price 3/2/10 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (59-pgs/johnson 5/17/10 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (160-pgs/johnson 5/18/10 proc.)w/cd
07/08/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/13/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/27/2011FiledRecord Index (11cv511 & 11cv420)
08/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 12, 2011 (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
09/12/2011FiledAppendix Vol I thruIII (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
10/31/2011FiledOpposition - to aple/cross aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledBrief of Lola Cheltenham (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
12/21/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
12/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/29/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/11/2012FiledLetter From Gerard J. Stief letter cour know that he will argue case on behalf of WMATA (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/26/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Fisher, Easterly Gerard J. Stief, Esq. for aplt-cross-aple Gregory L. Lattimer, Esq. for aple-cross-aplt
12/05/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
12/19/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Denied
12/28/2012FiledMandate
01/02/2013FiledOpposition to Motion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
01/07/2013FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS//OPPO
02/14/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR COSTS